OK SB1541 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Human services; transferring powers and duties of Office of Disability Concerns to State Department of Rehabilitation Services.
Title
Human services; transferring powers and duties of Office of Disability Concerns to State Department of Rehabilitation Services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2016-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 166 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 166 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 166 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 166 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 21 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 23 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 27A | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 33 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |