OK SB154 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB154
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Incentive Evaluation Act; expanding actions which may be taken by Incentive Evaluation Commission.
Title
Incentive Evaluation Act; expanding actions which may be taken by Incentive Evaluation Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Rep. Greg Babinec [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Dugger |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Babinec (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dugger |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB154 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017