OK SB1539 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing Department of Corrections to process and export certain agricultural products. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing Department of Corrections to process and export certain agricultural products. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Donnie Condit [D] |
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-02 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-17 | HAs read | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-16 | Amended | |
2012-04-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit, Roberts (Dustin), Walker | |
2012-04-16 | General Order | |
2012-04-05 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-08 | coauthored by Allen | |
2012-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brecheen | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |