OK SB1535 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School funding; creating a task force to study the State Aid formula. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School funding; creating a task force to study the State Aid formula. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Effective Date restored |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Stanislawski |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Loveless |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | coauthored by Casey (principal House author) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |