OK SB1524 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Roofing Contractor Registration Act; adding provision to certain exemption; providing for alternative insurance requirement. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Roofing Contractor Registration Act; adding provision to certain exemption; providing for alternative insurance requirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (Mike) (principal House author) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1151 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1151 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |