OK SB1520 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings; specifying retainage amount for certain contracts. Effective date.
Title
Public buildings; specifying retainage amount for certain contracts. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2022-04-28 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |