OK SB1517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; modifying provisions related to Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Board. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; modifying provisions related to Medicaid Drug Utilization Review Board. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 16 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Motion expired |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Coleman |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 25 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Coleman |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Smalley; authored by Senator McCortney |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |