OK SB1515 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; creating the Oklahoma Water Resources Board Fee Revolving Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Water Resources Board; creating the Oklahoma Water Resources Board Fee Revolving Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regularoty Services sub-committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regularoty Services |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |