OK SB1514 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Banking and Business
Pending: House Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Consumer protection; unlawful acts; adding certain internet services. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer protection; unlawful acts; adding certain internet services. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking and Business
2018-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 4
2018-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2018-03-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
2018-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative Faught (principal House author)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback