OK SB1513 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-25 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 74
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

School employees; prohibiting school districts from requiring employees to participate in certain activities or distributing informational materials; prohibiting access to school facilities or equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School employees; prohibiting school districts from requiring employees to participate in certain activities or distributing informational materials; prohibiting access to school facilities or equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 14 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 74
2024-04-25HouseAmended
2024-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2024-04-25HouseHouse Rule suspended
2024-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2024-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2024-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2024-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2024-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2024-03-07SenateEmergency failed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 14
2024-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 14
2024-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2024-03-05SenateCoauthored by Representative McDugle
2024-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author)
2024-02-20SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2024-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2024-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2024-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1513&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB1513%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB1513%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB1513%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1513%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB1513%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB1513%20FULLAMD1%20TONI%20HASENBECK-MJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB1513%20FA1%20HASENBECKTO-MJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB1513%20FA2%20RANSONTR-MJ.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB1513%20FA3%20HASENBECKTO-MJ(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB1513%20FA4%20HASENBECKTO-MJ(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1513%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB1513%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20FULLAMD1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20HCS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20FA3%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20FA4%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1513%20FA1-A4%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1513_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1513_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback