OK SB1513 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Electrical License Act; setting ratio of journeyman to apprentices. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electrical License Act; setting ratio of journeyman to apprentices. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseCR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking and Business
2018-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-08SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-08SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 5
2018-03-08SenateTitle restored
2018-03-08SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author)
2018-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-15SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Daniels
2018-02-15SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-15SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback