OK SB1513 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Electrical License Act; setting ratio of journeyman to apprentices. Effective date.
Title
Electrical License Act; setting ratio of journeyman to apprentices. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mulready (principal House author) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Daniels |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |