OK SB1508 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Master conservancy districts; prohibiting certain employees from serving on certain boards; board members travel reimbursement.
Title
Master conservancy districts; prohibiting certain employees from serving on certain boards; board members travel reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/16/2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 2 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 31; Ayes: 29 Nays: 46 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-07 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2014-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Ortega (principal House author) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |