OK SB1504 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax; income tax credit for preceptorship rotation; creating and specifying sources of funds; providing for transfer of monies to Oklahoma Tax Commission; authorizing administrative expenditures. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; income tax credit for preceptorship rotation; creating and specifying sources of funds; providing for transfer of monies to Oklahoma Tax Commission; authorizing administrative expenditures. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2024-04-04HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2024-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2024-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2024-03-12HouseFirst Reading
2024-03-12SenateEngrossed to House
2024-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2024-03-11SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
2024-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2024-02-19SenateEmergency added
2024-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
2024-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2024-02-05SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2024-02-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Garvin
2024-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
2024-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1504&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB1504%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB1504%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB1504%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB1504%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB1504%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1504%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB1504%20(3-07-24)%20(KRISTEN%20THOMPSON)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1504%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB1504%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1504%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB1504%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB1504%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB1504_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB1504_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback