OK SB1497 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Grau
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - coauthored by Grau
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Commissioner; establishing earthquake insurance program. Effective date.
Title
Insurance Commissioner; establishing earthquake insurance program. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | coauthored by Grau |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1497&Session=1600 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1497%20INT.PDF |