OK SB1497 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Consumer Protection Act; going out of business practices; expanding time frame. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Consumer Protection Act; going out of business practices; expanding time frame. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-08 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-10 | HAs read | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-09 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-09 | Amended | |
2012-04-09 | General Order | |
2012-03-29 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Mulready (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brinkley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |