OK SB1493 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Oklahoma Certified Real Estate Appraisers Act; procedure for license upgrade. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Certified Real Estate Appraisers Act; procedure for license upgrade. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-03 Sent to Governor
2012-05-03 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-03 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-02 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-02 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-02 HAs adopted
2012-04-12 HAs read
2012-04-12 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-11 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-11 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2012-04-11 General Order
2012-04-05 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services
2012-03-06 First Reading
2012-03-06 Engrossed to House
2012-03-05 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-05 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2012-03-05 General Order, Considered
2012-02-27 coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author)
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Paddack
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59858708New CodeSee Bill Text
59858713New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback