OK SB1492 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act; authorizing certain licensees to work remotely under certain conditions. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act; authorizing certain licensees to work remotely under certain conditions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 5 |
2024-04-23 | House | General Order |
2024-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |