OK SB1485 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certificates of title; providing exception for certain industry from inspection requirement. Effective date.
Title
Certificates of title; providing exception for certain industry from inspection requirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-19 | House | General Order |
2022-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency |
2022-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |