OK SB1481 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Conference granted, naming GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Franchise Tax Code; repealing tax after certain year. Effective date.
Title
Franchise Tax Code; repealing tax after certain year. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Gerrid Kendrix [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-04 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2022-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-04-28 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 8 |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Quinn |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix (principal House author) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Treat |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Montgomery |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |