OK SB1481 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Scrap Metal Dealers Act; modifying requirements. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Scrap Metal Dealers Act; modifying requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |