OK SB148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Virtual charter schools; directing the transfer of students to be subject to certain requirements. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virtual charter schools; directing the transfer of students to be subject to certain requirements. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Representative Fincher (principal House author)
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback