OK SB1465 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; restricting issuance of certain ordinances. Emergency.
Title
Environment and natural resources; restricting issuance of certain ordinances. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - House: General Government Oversight and Accountability Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Emergency (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Emergency (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government Oversight and Accountability |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 12 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Downing (principal House author) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |