OK SB1458 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Game; increasing punishment for headlighting deer. Effective date.
Title
Game; increasing punishment for headlighting deer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Silk |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |