OK SB1450 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Treasurer; modifying Uniform Unclaimed Property Act; modifying investment of state funds by Treasurer. Effective date.
Title
State Treasurer; modifying Uniform Unclaimed Property Act; modifying investment of state funds by Treasurer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Approved by Governor 04/24/2012 | |
2012-04-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-17 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-17 | General Order | |
2012-04-10 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-23 | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Brinkley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 674 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 89 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |