OK SB145 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB145
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; procedures relating to presidential elections. Effective date.
Title
Elections; procedures relating to presidential elections. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-27 | House | General Order |
2017-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | coauthored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB145 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2017