OK SB1442 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Firearms; carrying of firearms by certain attorneys, judges and Attorney General; clarifying training requirement; identification cards. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; carrying of firearms by certain attorneys, judges and Attorney General; clarifying training requirement; identification cards. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 5 |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Dahm, Barrington, Ellis, David, Treat, Sparks |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 23 |
2014-04-22 | House | Title stricken |
2014-04-22 | House | Amended |
2014-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2014-04-22 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Martin (Steve) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 215 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3311 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |