OK SB144 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Physician Manpower Training Commission; broadening eligibility; funding. Effective date.
Title
Physician Manpower Training Commission; broadening eligibility; funding. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-22 | Senate | remove as coauthor Representative(s) McEntire |
2017-05-22 | Senate | coauthored by McEntire |
2017-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2017-05-08 | Senate | SCs named Smalley, Yen, Griffin, Simpson, McCortney, Floyd, Pittman |
2017-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 16 |
2017-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martin (principal House author) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Smalley |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB144 (Carry Over) 2017-05-22 - Conferees unable to agree
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2721 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2723 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 625 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 21a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 697 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |