OK SB144 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Special license plates; design for new official license plate; providing for special plates. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special license plates; design for new official license plate; providing for special plates. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 3
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2015-05-20SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2015-05-19SenateCCR read, GCCA
2015-05-13Senatecoauthored by Loveless
2015-05-04HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2015-04-30SenateSCs named GCCA
2015-04-29SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-28Senatecoauthored by Osborn
2015-04-21SenateHAs read
2015-04-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
2015-04-20HouseTitle restored
2015-04-20HouseAmended
2015-04-20HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-02HouseTitle stricken
2015-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2015-03-30HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee sub-committee
2015-03-11HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-17SenateEngrossed to House
2015-02-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-02-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 11
2015-02-16SenateTitle restored
2015-02-16SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-02-09Senatecoauthored by Wright (principal House author)
2015-02-03SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Holt
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711134Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4711353New CodeSee Bill Text
4711355New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb144&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB144%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB144%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB144%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB144%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB144%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB144%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB144_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB144_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback