OK SB1425 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Court fines and costs; modifying requirements and procedures for payment of fines, costs, fees or assessments. Effective date.
Title
Court fines and costs; modifying requirements and procedures for payment of fines, costs, fees or assessments. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |