OK SB1424 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prisons and reformatories; granting wage increase to correctional professionals. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons and reformatories; granting wage increase to correctional professionals. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
2020-04-06HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2020-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2020-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2020-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2020-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2020-03-09SenateEmergency clause restored
2020-03-09SenateTitle restored
2020-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2020-02-25SenateCoauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author)
2020-02-19SenateEmergency clause stricken
2020-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2020-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2020-02-17SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2020-02-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Hall
2020-02-10SenateRemove as author Senator Hall; authored by Senator Pugh
2020-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Hall
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback