OK SB142 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Long-term care; setting forth certain conditions on administration and prescribing of certain drugs with respect to residents. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Long-term care; setting forth certain conditions on administration and prescribing of certain drugs with respect to residents. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateApproved by Governor 05/07/2019
2019-05-02SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-02HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-01SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-01SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-05-01SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-22SenateHAs read
2019-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2019-04-17HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Hill, Goodwin, West (Josh)
2019-04-17HouseConsidered
2019-04-17HouseLaid over
2019-04-17HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
2019-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bush, Stark, Blancett, Munson, Grego, Dills
2019-04-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-03-25HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-25HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-20HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
2019-02-19SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-12SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb142&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB142%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB142%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB142%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB142%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB142%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB142%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB142%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB142%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB142_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB142_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback