OK SB1416 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; providing in-state status for current Oklahoma National Guard members. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; providing in-state status for current Oklahoma National Guard members. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] |
Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/20/2022 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck, Fugate |
2022-04-14 | House | General Order |
2022-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2022-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 2 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |