OK SB1414 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Senate districts; removing expired filing requirement. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State Senate districts; removing expired filing requirement. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-19 | House | General Order |
2022-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2022-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |