OK SB1410 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Money and wire transmission fee; modifying apportionment. Effective date.
Title
Money and wire transmission fee; modifying apportionment. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |