OK SB141 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor Vehicle Reports; modifying certain fees. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Reports; modifying certain fees. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateVeto message read
2015-06-04SenateVetoed 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-21HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-21SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
2015-05-20SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2015-05-19SenateEnacting clause restored
2015-05-19SenateTitle restored
2015-05-19SenateCCR read, GCCA
2015-05-13Senatecoauthored by Sanders
2015-05-13Senateremove as principal author Representative Sanders and substitute with Representative O'Donnell
2015-05-04HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2015-04-29SenateSCs named GCCA
2015-04-27SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-15SenateHAs read
2015-04-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2015-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-08HouseEnacting clause stricken
2015-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2015-03-30HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee sub-committee
2015-03-11HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2015-03-11HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2015-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-02-26Senatecoauthored by Sanders (principal House author)
2015-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2015-02-11SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
476117New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb141&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB141%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB141%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB141%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB141%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB141%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB141%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB141_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB141_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback