OK SB1409 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School counselors; requiring school counselors to spend certain percentage of time on direct services. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
School counselors; requiring school counselors to spend certain percentage of time on direct services. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 22 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Dossett |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 19 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Condit (principal House author) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dossett |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |