OK SB1409 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Department of Education; making an appropriation; modifying appropriation amount. Effective date.
Title
State Department of Education; making an appropriation; modifying appropriation amount. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0; Ayes: 66 Nays: 27 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-27 | Title restored | |
2010-05-27 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-03-23 | HAs read | |
2010-03-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 4 | |
2010-03-22 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-22 | Amended | |
2010-03-22 | General Order | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-03 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-03 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-04 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Miller, Martin (Scott) (principal House author) | |
2010-02-01 | coauthored by Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |