OK SB1408 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; adding responsibilities of Oklahoma Partnership for School Readiness Board. Effective date.
Title
Children; adding responsibilities of Oklahoma Partnership for School Readiness Board. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-26 | House | General Order |
2022-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2022-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |