OK SB1404 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State government; Executive Branch Reform Act; establishing limit on certain compensation. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; Executive Branch Reform Act; establishing limit on certain compensation. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 15
2018-03-15SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-03-15SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Daniels
2018-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Ritze (principal House author)
2018-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2018-03-01SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74103New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback