OK SB1404 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; prohibiting Oklahoma School for the Visual and Performing Arts from offering campus summer arts camp programs for certain students during certain time period.
Title
Schools; prohibiting Oklahoma School for the Visual and Performing Arts from offering campus summer arts camp programs for certain students during certain time period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/12/2010 | |
2010-05-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-10 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-10 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-06 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-06 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-14 | HAs read | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 27; Ayes: 64 Nays: 24 | |
2010-04-13 | Title restored | |
2010-04-13 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-13 | General Order | |
2010-04-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-02-17 | coauthored by Peters (principal House author) | |
2010-02-17 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-15 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Peters | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Burrage | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |