OK SB1403 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; expanding language relating to certain election requirements. Effective date.
Title
Elections; expanding language relating to certain election requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-18 | House | General Order |
2018-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |