OK SB1398 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; modifying Oklahoma Vessel and Motor Registration Act; modifying notice procedures relating to registration renewal; requiring certain information. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; modifying Oklahoma Vessel and Motor Registration Act; modifying notice procedures relating to registration renewal; requiring certain information. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Motion expired | |
2010-05-25 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman | |
2010-05-25 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-19 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-11 | Conference granted, HC's named Hickman, Brannon, McDaniel (Randy), Ownbey, Cox | |
2010-05-11 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-05-10 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-04-12 | Title restored | |
2010-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Withdrawn from Transportation Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Hickman (principal House author) | |
2010-02-18 | coauthored by Stanislawski | |
2010-02-18 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Hickman | |
2010-02-03 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Stanislawski | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Mazzei | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |