OK SB1390 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services; requiring employee background checks to include certain national record check. Effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; requiring employee background checks to include certain national record check. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget, Direct to Calendar |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Townley (principal House author) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |