OK SB139 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB139
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma State University Medical Authority; adding recipients of certain annual report. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State University Medical Authority; adding recipients of certain annual report. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Died in GCCA |
2021-05-06 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2021-05-04 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2021-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2021-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-20 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2021-04-20 | House | Title stricken |
2021-04-20 | House | Amended |
2021-04-20 | House | General Order |
2021-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB139 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Died in GCCA