OK SB1376 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Measure failed: Ayes: 13 Nays: 34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Measure failed: Ayes: 13 Nays: 34
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor license agents; eliminating authority for certain fee related to specified online transaction. Effective date.
Title
Motor license agents; eliminating authority for certain fee related to specified online transaction. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 13 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 13 Nays: 34 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |