OK SB1375 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Vehicle Weight and Load; creating weight formula for certain permits; providing penalties for vehicles in excess of weight limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Weight and Load; creating weight formula for certain permits; providing penalties for vehicles in excess of weight limits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseEnacting clause stricken
2018-04-16HouseTitle stricken
2018-04-16HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Babinec
2018-04-16HouseRemove Representative Vaughan as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Dustin)
2018-04-16HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin)
2018-04-16HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2018-04-12HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2018-03-15HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2018-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2018-03-14SenateTitle restored
2018-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
2018-02-21SenateCoauthored by Representative Vaughan (principal House author)
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-02-13SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-02-13SenateTitle stricken
2018-02-13SenateReported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-02-05SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4714101New CodeSee Bill Text
4714109New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback