OK SB1365 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School funding; directing the deduction of certain amount from the allocation to certain statewide virtual charter schools. Effective date.
Title
School funding; directing the deduction of certain amount from the allocation to certain statewide virtual charter schools. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |