OK SB1364 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Polling places; providing for additional polling places for certain precincts. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Polling places; providing for additional polling places for certain precincts. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2022-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |