OK SB1360 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Organ donation; providing certain construction. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organ donation; providing certain construction. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-31 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04SenateHAs read
2016-04-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-31HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-31HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
2016-03-31HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McCall, Leewright
2016-03-31HouseGeneral Order
2016-03-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Thomsen
2016-03-28HouseTitle restored
2016-03-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2016-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2016-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2016-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2016-03-07SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-03-07SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2016-03-07SenateTitle stricken
2016-03-07SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-03-02Senatecoauthored by Simpson
2016-03-01Senatecoauthored by Paddack
2016-02-25Senatecoauthored by Ownbey (principal House author)
2016-02-22SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2016-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63220014ANew CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1360&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB1360%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB1360%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB1360%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB1360%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB1360%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB1360%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB1360_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB1360_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback